CT HB05358 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure a seamless transition of children among behavioral health providers.
Title
An Act Concerning The Seamless Transition Of Children Among Behavioral Health Providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-02-06 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-02-05 | House | Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-01-22 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Children |
2019-01-22 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Children |
2019-01-18 | House | Change of Reference Children |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |