CT HB05355 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To waive the thirty-dollar fee for any individual who wishes to indicate his or her status as a veteran on a reissued motor vehicle operator's license or identity card prior to the expiration date of a previously issued license or identity card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Eliminating Certain Driver's License Fees For Veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2016-03-23HouseFile Number 145
2016-03-23HouseHouse Calendar Number 127
2016-03-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-03-23HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-17HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM
2016-03-09HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-08HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2016-02-19HousePublic Hearing 02/23
2016-02-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback