CT HB05355 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - File Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require local and regional boards of education to adopt policies or enter into memoranda of understanding with law enforcement agencies concerning the use of law enforcement personnel as school resource officers in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Collaboration Between Boards Of Education And School Resource Officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 64 AS AMENDED (Y: 102 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-21HouseFile Number 647
2014-04-21HouseSenate Calendar Number 434
2014-04-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-17HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2014-04-17HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3758
2014-04-07HouseFile Number 403
2014-04-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 238
2014-04-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2014-04-07HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-31HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
2014-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2014-02-27HousePublic Hearing 03/03
2014-02-26HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback