CT HB05355 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To provide Connecticut museums, libraries and archives a means to establish clear title to property in their possession.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Museum Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 433 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 197 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2012-05-31 Transmitted to the Secretary of State
2012-05-30 Public Act 12-171
2012-05-09 On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2012-05-09 Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-09 Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-04 File Number 640
2012-05-04 Senate Calendar Number 483
2012-05-04 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-05-03 Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
2012-05-03 House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-03 House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4570
2012-04-25 Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-04-25 No New File by Committee on Judiciary
2012-04-25 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-25 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-25 Joint Favorable
2012-04-20 Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2012-04-02 File Number 219
2012-04-02 House Calendar Number 187
2012-04-02 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-04-02 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-26 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM
2012-03-15 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-14 Joint Favorable
2012-03-01 Public Hearing 03/05
2012-02-29 Referred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback