CT HB05355 | 2011 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
Pending: Joint Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To reduce the amount that mortgage servicing companies may require mortgagors to pay into an escrow account for the purpose of maintaining a reserve for the payment of real estate taxes or insurance premiums.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Mortgage Escrow Payments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-02 Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
2011-03-01 Drafted by Committee
2011-02-15 Vote to Draft
2011-02-04 Public Hearing 02/10
2011-02-01 Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2011-01-19 Referred to Joint Committee on Banks

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback