CT HB05355 | 2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - File Number 368
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a pilot program to provide advanced dental hygienist practitioner services in public health facilities located in the city of Hartford.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning An Advanced Dental Hygiene Practice Pilot Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-07 File Number 368
2010-04-07 House Calendar Number 200
2010-04-07 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2010-04-07 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-30 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM
2010-03-23 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-23 Joint Favorable Substitute
2010-02-26 Public Hearing 03/02
2010-02-24 Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback