CT HB05353 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-12-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-12-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To improve the dissemination and communication of information regarding individualized education programs to parents and guardians and to improve the quality of education for teachers in the implementation of individualized education programs; to require that any special education services provided by a school district to a student whose parents have chosen to send him or her to a private school comply with the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act; to require that the state special education excess cost grant goes to the district that is financially responsible for paying the tuition costs for a child; and to make technical corrections to the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Individualized Education Programs And Other Issues Relating To Special Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 423 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 165 LCO # 3873 (Y: 50 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 165 LCO # 3873 (Y: 50 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-173 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Calendar Number 455 | |
2012-05-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-01 | House Passed | |
2012-05-01 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 3873 | |
2012-04-16 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-16 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-29 | File Number 183 | |
2012-03-29 | House Calendar Number 150 | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |