CT HB05352 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt any veteran or member of the armed forces with a disability rating of at least seventy per cent from paying the fee for a special number plate for his or her motor vehicle.
Title
An Act Concerning Veterans' Plates From The Department Of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-21 | House | File Number 67 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 84 |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |