CT HB05343 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to order fines, restitution to customers or a combination of fines and restitution, to require that civil penalties for failure to comply related to excavation, demolition or discharge of explosives in relation to underground utilities be paid by the person, agency or public utility to whom the notice of such failure to comply is addressed and to change the time frame for the calculation of lost and unaccounted for gas.
Title
An Act Concerning Fines Ordered By The Public Utilities Regulatory Authority, Civil Penalties For Failures To Comply Related To Excavation, Demolition Or Discharge Of Explosives And Certain Time Frames For Calculating Lost And Unaccounted For Gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 313 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5976 |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 191 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 150 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |