CT HB05343 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To empower the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to perform an in-depth analysis of the state's brownfield remediation and development programs and recommend changes to such programs.
Title
An Act Concerning Economic Development Through Streamlined And Improved Brownfield Remediation Programs, Exempting Certain Airport Conveyances From The Department Of Transportation To The Connecticut Airport Authority From The Hazardous Waste Establishment Transfer Act, And Holding Harmless And Indemnifying The Connecticut Airport Authority And Its Employees And Directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 444 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-196 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-07 | Senate Calendar Number 521 | |
2012-05-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-07 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2012-05-07 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-07 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5199 | |
2012-04-20 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Environment | |
2012-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-17 | Referred by House to Committee on Environment | |
2012-04-12 | File Number 389 | |
2012-04-12 | House Calendar Number 299 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-27 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |