CT HB05342 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - File Number 652
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - File Number 652
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to study issues relating to best practices for social-emotional learning.
Title
An Act Establishing A Working Group To Study Best Practices Regarding Social-emotional Learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 74 AS AMENDED (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | File Number 652 |
2018-04-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 436 |
2018-04-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4026 |
2018-03-29 | House | File Number 129 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 104 |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |