CT HB05341 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To add "criminal violation of a standing criminal protective order" to the enumerated crimes designated as persistent offender crimes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Designation Of A Person Convicted Of Criminal Violation Of A Standing Criminal Protective Order As A Persistent Offender.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 411 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-20 | House | Public Act 14-147 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 465 |
2014-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-15 | House | File Number 548 |
2014-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 359 |
2014-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |