CT HB05340 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To conduct a study of education savings accounts.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Education Savings Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | House | File Number 315 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 210 |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-20 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Banking |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Banking |
2018-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Banking |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |