CT HB05340 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to certain statutes concerning public housing.
Title
An Act Concerning The Replacement Of Housing Projects By Housing Authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 360 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 185 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 185 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 16-108 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | File Number 773 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 561 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5053 |
2016-03-23 | House | File Number 144 |
2016-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 126 |
2016-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |