CT HB05339 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the civil penalties for failure to register a residential property both before and after title to such property vests.
Title
An Act Concerning Penalties For The Failure To Register A Residential Property By A Foreclosing Party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-05 | House | No New File by Committee on Banking |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Banking |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 184 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 149 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |