CT HB05337 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 65
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 65
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require a surety bond from any developer who submits an affordable housing application to a zoning commission, and (2) allow a municipality to award funds from a tax increment district master plan fund for improvements to certain affordable housing if pursuant to an agreement with the owner to renew the affordable deed covenants or restrictions concerning such affordable housing.
Title
An Act Concerning Affordable Housing Development Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 65 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 77 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |