CT HB05335 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To align the coordinated state-wide reading plan for students in kindergarten to grade three with the state's two-generational initiative.
Title
An Act Concerning The Alignment Of The Coordinated State-wide Reading Plan With The State's Two-generational Initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 350 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-24 | House | Public Act 18-129 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-04-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 309 |
2018-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | File Number 150 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 121 |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |