CT HB05334 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 64
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 64
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the majority leaders' roundtable group on affordable housing to study the effectiveness of residence mobility counseling programs in the state.
Title
An Act Requiring The Majority Leaders' Roundtable Group On Affordable Housing To Study Residential Mobility Counseling Programs In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 64 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 76 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |