CT HB05331 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-13 - Senate Calendar Number 305
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-13 - Senate Calendar Number 305
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the requirement that the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children electronically transmit the Children's Report Card to certain entities, and to specify the membership of the leadership committee with which said committee shall consult.
Title
An Act Concerning The Children's Report Card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 32 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 305 |
2018-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | File Number 75 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 89 |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |