CT HB05329 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To enable Connecticut hospitals to use telepharmacy for the dispensing of sterile products.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Telepharmacy By Hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 230 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 76 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 76 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-08 | Public Act 12-28 | |
2012-05-01 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Passed | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Calendar Number 372 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-17 | House Passed | |
2012-04-11 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-11 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-03-26 | File Number 101 | |
2012-03-26 | House Calendar Number 113 | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |