CT HB05328 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To render inadmissible in any proceeding concerning the alleged delinquency of a child under the age of eighteen any admission, confession or statement made by such child to a police officer or Juvenile Court official unless such statement was made in the presence of such child's parent or guardian after such parent or guardian and child have been apprised of such child's rights.
Title
An Act Concerning The Admissibility Of Admissions, Confessions And Statements By Children Under The Age Of Eighteen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | House | File Number 123 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 105 |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |