CT HB05328 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a fine art secured lender license.
Title
An Act Establishing A Fine Art Secured Lending License.
Sponsors
Rep. David Baram [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Boukus [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] |
House General Law Committee | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 438 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 218 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-29 | Public Act 12-131 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-05 | File Number 650 | |
2012-05-05 | Senate Calendar Number 505 | |
2012-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-04 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4234 | |
2012-05-03 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-05-03 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-05-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-05-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-05-01 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-22 | File Number 89 | |
2012-03-22 | House Calendar Number 101 | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |