CT HB05327 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Regulate electric distribution companies' use of energy storage systems; (2) permit the preauthorization of energy storage systems that enhance reliability; (3) create a pilot program to demonstrate how energy storage systems can increase the resiliency of critical infrastructure; and (4) require the Division of Emergency Management and Homeland Security and electric distribution companies to make plans to maintain reliable emergency or backup power for critical infrastructure.
Title
An Act Concerning Energy Storage Systems And Electric Distribution System Reliability.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Rep. William Petit [R] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 319 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 43 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 43 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-10 | House | Public Act 22-55 |
2022-05-03 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-18 | House | File Number 515 |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 372 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-13 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4562 |
2022-04-06 | House | File Number 330 |
2022-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 242 |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |