CT HB05321 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to various public health statutes involving the Office of Health Care Access.
Title
An Act Concerning The Office Of Health Care Access.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Berger [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | House Public Health Committee | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Rep. John Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 434 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 200 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 200 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-170 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2012-05-04 | File Number 636 | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Calendar Number 488 | |
2012-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-03 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2012-05-03 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4555 | |
2012-05-03 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4272 | |
2012-04-16 | File Number 439 | |
2012-04-16 | House Calendar Number 336 | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-30 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-29 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |