CT HB05314 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Public Hearing 03/07
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Public Hearing 03/07
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Consumer Protection to establish and administer a program by which persons twenty-one years of age or older may legally purchase and cultivate marijuana and to require the Department of Revenue Services to establish and administer a tax structure that will provide revenue to the General Fund, Budget Reserve Fund and certain municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Regulation And Taxation Of The Retail Sale And Cultivation Of Marijuana For Use By Persons Twenty-one Years Of Age Or Older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2017-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-26 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2017-01-26 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health |
2017-01-26 | House | Change of Reference to Public Health |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |