CT HB05309 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To update Connecticut's abandoned vessels statute in order to facilitate the disposition of such property.
Title
An Act Concerning Abandoned Vessels.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Timothy Bowles [D] | Rep. Stephen Walko [R] | Rep. John Shaban [R] |
Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Sen. Carlo Leone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 313 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 138 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 138 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-09 | House | Public Act 14-57 |
2014-05-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-28 | House | File Number 698 |
2014-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 504 |
2014-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4302 |
2014-04-09 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | File Number 45 |
2014-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 42 |
2014-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |