CT HB05307 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To remove an outdated restriction placed on registered interior designers.
Title
An Act Concerning Registered Interior Designers.
Sponsors
Rep. David Aldarondo [D] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Rep. Louis Esposito [D] | House General Law Committee |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Frank Nicastro [D] | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 412 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-169 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-20 | Senate Calendar Number 393 | |
2012-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-20 | File Number 567 | |
2012-04-18 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-18 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3379 | |
2012-03-22 | File Number 83 | |
2012-03-22 | House Calendar Number 95 | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |