CT HB05300 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Box
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Box
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require infant formula, baby food and children's foods that are produced partially or entirely with genetically engineered materials to be labelled as such.
Title
An Act Concerning Children's Food And Genetic Engineering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Box |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred by House to Committee on General Law |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 179 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 144 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |