CT HB05299 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the age for eligibility for the post-secondary education funding program offered by the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Increasing The Age For Eligibility For The Postsecondary Education Funding Program Offered By The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-04 | House | File Number 277 |
2022-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 208 |
2022-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |