CT HB05291 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To study best practices concerning the delivery of health and human services and related information by senior centers, municipal agents and other municipal stakeholders to senior citizens.
Title
An Act Concerning Senior Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 404 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 408 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 408 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Special Act 16-7 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-25 | House | File Number 720 |
2016-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 493 |
2016-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-21 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4359 |
2016-03-23 | House | File Number 141 |
2016-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 123 |
2016-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |