CT HB05290 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make revisions to the motor vehicle laws.
Title
An Act Revising Motor Vehicle Laws.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Rep. David Scribner [R] | Rep. Brandon McGee [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 426 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 179 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 179 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Public Act 14-130 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | File Number 730 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 533 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4390 |
2014-04-24 | House | File Number 670 |
2014-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-24 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-03 | House | File Number 343 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 205 |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |