CT HB05285 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - File Number 569
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - File Number 569
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that all school districts provide climate change instruction as part of the science curriculum, to establish a pilot program for the teaching of financial literacy and to establish the Connecticut Civics Education Task Force.
Title
An Act Concerning The Public School Curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | File Number 569 |
2022-04-21 | House | House Calendar Number 411 |
2022-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |