CT HB05283 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require municipalities to defend and indemnify neighborhood revitalization zone planning committees and their members in certain civil actions.
Title
An Act Concerning Neighborhood Revitalization Zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 317 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-23 | House | Public Act 18-110 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 431 |
2018-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-10 | House | House Reconsidered and Retained |
2018-04-10 | House | House Reconsidered Bill |
2018-04-10 | House | Rules Suspended |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 184 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 143 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |