CT HB05283 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow for the waiver of restrictions on advance payments for nursing facilities in receivership.
Title
An Act Waiving Advance Payment Restrictions For Certain Nursing Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | House Human Services Committee | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. Carlo Leone [D] |
Rep. Bruce Morris [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 405 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 (Y: 126 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 (Y: 126 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-29 | Public Act 12-130 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed | |
2012-04-09 | Senate Calendar Number 240 | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-04 | House Passed | |
2012-03-27 | File Number 140 | |
2012-03-27 | House Calendar Number 119 | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |