CT HB05274 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt from the fee for the issuance of a cremation certificate the cremation of the body of a person under the age of eighteen.
Title
An Act Concerning The Fee For A Cremation Certificate For Deceased Persons Under The Age Of Eighteen.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Kara Rochelle [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Rep. Kathy Kennedy [R] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 227 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 227 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 22-99 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 569 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-04 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-23 | House | File Number 111 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 114 |
2022-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |