CT HB05274 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - File Number 770
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - File Number 770
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) establish the crime of using computer software or technology, including a drone, which allows someone who is not physically present to release tear gas or control a deadly weapon, explosive or incendiary device, (2) limit the use of a drone by law enforcement and other state agencies, and (3) establish retention and destruction requirements for information collected by law enforcement using drones.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Drones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 194 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-30 | Senate | File Number 770 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 566 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5515 |
2016-04-22 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-22 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2016-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2016-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-31 | House | File Number 337 |
2016-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 231 |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |