CT HB05271 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require (1) state and local police training programs to provide training on handling incidents involving individuals affected with a developmental disability and to require the duration of training on individuals affected with a serious mental illness or developmental disability to be not less than two hours; and (2) on-call mental health services providers.
Title
An Act Concerning Mental Health Training In State And Local Police Training Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-29 | House | File Number 225 |
2016-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 168 |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-11 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2016-03-10 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Safety and Security |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |