CT HB05270 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the date of the termination of the foreclosure mediation program.
Title
An Act Concerning Foreclosure Mediation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 434 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-26 | Public Act 10-181 | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Calendar Number 557 | |
2010-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-03 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-03 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5088 | |
2010-04-20 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-13 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-13 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-07 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-01 | File Number 273 | |
2010-04-01 | House Calendar Number 148 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-03 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |