CT HB05266 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Education to (1) evaluate school districts' student work release policies, (2) develop a model student work release policy, and (3) provide guidance to local and regional boards of education regarding such model student work release policy and to require each local or regional board of education to adopt a student work release policy based on guidance provided by the commissioner.
Title
An Act Concerning Student Work Release Policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | House | File Number 230 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 193 |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |