CT HB05262 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To amend the Pharmacy Practice Act and Department of Consumer Protection statutes regarding programs under the jurisdiction of the Department of Social Services, sterile compounding pharmacies, nonresident pharmacies, compounding pharmacies and counterfeit substances.
Title
An Act Concerning The Pharmacy Practice Act And Counterfeit Drugs Or Devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 445 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-23 | House | Public Act 14-224 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 590 |
2014-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5519 |
2014-04-16 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-16 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | House | File Number 243 |
2014-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 150 |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |