CT HB05261 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Public Hearing 02/07
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Public Hearing 02/07
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that home improvement contractors are paid for services provided to persons in emergency situations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Emergency Home Repair Services By Home Improvement Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05261&which_year=2017 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/h/2017HB-05261-R00-HB.htm |