CT HB05253 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To expand access to the Money Follows the Person demonstration project and repeal obsolete statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding Access To The Money Follows The Person Demonstration Project And Repealing Obsolete Statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 347 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-05-24HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-24HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-22HousePublic Act 18-99
2018-05-09HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-05-09HouseSenate Passed
2018-04-12HouseSenate Calendar Number 272
2018-04-12HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-10HouseHouse Passed
2018-03-28HouseFile Number 67
2018-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 81
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-16HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-02-28HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback