CT HB05249 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 493
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 493
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require any person awaiting sentencing for aggravated sexual assault to be monitored by a GPS device.
Title
An Act Concerning Gps Monitoring Of Convicted Persons Awaiting Sentencing For Aggravated Sexual Assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | File Number 493 |
2018-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 336 |
2018-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |