CT HB05236 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To allow a passenger who is a veteran, upon presentation of a motor vehicle operator's license or identity card indicating such passenger's status as a veteran, to ride state-owned or controlled bus public transportation free of charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Bus Public Transportation For Veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-18HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2018-04-18HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-17HouseJoint Favorable
2018-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2018-03-26HouseFile Number 42
2018-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 62
2018-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-19HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM
2018-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2018-02-23HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2018-02-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback