CT HB05231 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To assess nutritional needs of senior citizens and allocate resources accordingly.
Title
An Act Concerning Data Collection To Prevent Malnutrition Among Senior Citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 293 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 33 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 33 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-11 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-11 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-06 | House | Public Act 22-32 |
2022-05-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Passed |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 371 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | File Number 326 |
2022-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 238 |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |