CT HB05229 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand a grant program that reimburses a municipality for the cost of dashboard cameras purchased during the fiscal years ending June 30, 2017, and June 30, 2018, and digital data storage devices or services purchased during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018.
Title
An Act Concerning Reimbursement For The Purchase Of Dashboard Cameras With A Remote Recorder And Digital Data Storage Devices Or Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 312 PASS (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 88 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 88 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | House | Public Act 18-107 |
2018-05-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-04-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 440 |
2018-04-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 179 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 138 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |