CT HB05216 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require banking institutions to make available low-cost bank accounts.
Title
An Act Concerning Low-cost Bank Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 356 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 40 AS AMENDED (Y: 109 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 40 AS AMENDED (Y: 109 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-19 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-19 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-77 |
2022-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-18 | House | File Number 513 |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 364 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-13 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4537 |
2022-03-23 | House | File Number 105 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 108 |
2022-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |