CT HB05214 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - File Number 310
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - File Number 310
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow medical assistants to administer vaccines and nebulizer treatments.
Title
An Act Allowing Medical Assistants To Administer Vaccines And Nebulizer Treatments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | File Number 310 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 205 |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |