CT HB05213 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a pilot program that authorizes the Commissioner of Early Childhood to issue a license to a person or group of persons to operate a family child care home in a space that is not a private home and that has been provided by an association, organization, corporation, institution or agency.
Title
An Act Concerning The Creation Of A Pilot Program For An Early Childhood Business Incubator Model.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |