CT HB05210 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an elder justice unit in the Division of Criminal Justice.
Title
An Act Establishing An Elder Justice Unit In The Division Of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
House Aging Committee | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] |
Rep. James Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | House | File Number 125 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 111 |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |